KY SB6 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 074)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 11A.211 to require disclosure of executive agency lobbyist compensation. Amend KRS 11A.236 to prohibit executive agency lobbyist compensation contingent on awarding of a government contract or based on a percentage of a government contract awarded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to executive branch ethics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1061 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 339 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 849 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 074)
2019-03-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateBill passed 37-0
2019-03-14SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) on Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-14House3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-12Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) Committee Substitute (1) filed
2019-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-04Houseposted in committee
2019-02-27Houseto State Government (H)
2019-02-26Housereceived in House
2019-02-25Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-01-10Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback