KY SB56 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - to Health & Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - to Health & Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to limit the number of managed care organization (MCO) contracts to operate the Medicaid program to three; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa2 sfta1 RSN# 1568 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | received in House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-5 with floor amendments (2) and (1-title) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-01-11 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Medical Assistance
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Medical Assistance