KY SB56 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 438.305 to change the definition of "proof of age"; amend KRS 438.310 to prohibit the sale of tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products to persons under the age of 21; amend KRS 438.311 to make it unlawful for persons under 21 to buy tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products; establish a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $500 for a person over the age of 18 who violates the age restrictions for purchasing or receiving tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products; remove status offense designation for violations by persons under 18; remove jurisdiction of the juvenile section of the District Court for violations by persons under 18; remove references to arrest and court appearances by persons under 18; amend KRS 438.313 to prohibit the wholesale, retail, or manufacturer distribution of tobacco or vapor products to persons under 21; remove references to arrest and court appearances for persons under 18; amend KRS 438.315 to raise the minimum age for vending machine sales of tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products to 21; remove references to arrest and court appearances for persons under 18; amend KRS 438.325 to establish 21 as the age limit regarding tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor product retail notifications; amend KRS 438.330 to set tobacco, alternative nicotine, and vapor product enforcement standards so that they relate to persons under the age of 21; amend KRS 438.350 regarding possession of tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor products by a person under age 21; amend KRS 600.020 to remove tobacco offenses from the definition of "status offense action"; amend 610.010 to remove tobacco related offenses as provided in KRS 438.305 to 438.340 from the jurisdiction of the juvenile section of the District Court; amend 630.020 to remove tobacco related offenses as provided in KRS 438.305 to 438.340 from the jurisdiction of the juvenile section of the District Court; amend 630.120 to remove the reference to child tobacco offenses under KRS 438.305 to 438.340; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the sale of tobacco, alternative nicotine, and vapor products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-15Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-08Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate
2019-12-12SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback