KY SB55 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.6312 to prohibit the cabinet or a managed care organization contracted to provide services from instituting copayments, cost sharing, or similar charges to be paid by any medical assistance recipients, their spouses, or parents, for any assistance provided pursuant KRS Chapter 205, federal law, or any federal Medicaid waiver; amend KRS 205.6485 to prohibit copayments to be charged in the Kentucky Children's Health Insurance Program; amend KRS 205.5591 to delete language permitting the application of deductible, copayment, and coinsurance requirements to Medicaid telehealth services.
Title
AN ACT relating to copayments by medical assistance recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 360 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1548 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1548 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-01 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | received in House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-1 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-01-11 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |