KY SB53 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 337.010 to redefine "employee" to include workers in sheltered workshops whose employment begins on or after January 1, 2024; amend KRS 337.295 to require new administrative regulations concerning sheltered workshops and sheltered workshop employment; amend KRS 205.5605 to exclude referrals to sheltered employment from the definition of "covered services and supports" as of January 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to sheltered employment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate
2019-12-12SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback