KY SB51 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 61)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 61)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 202A.400, relating to the duty to take precautions against a patient's violent behavior, to expand the definition of "patient" to include persons currently under the care or treatment of mental health professionals.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 61) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Bill passed 35-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute |
2015-03-10 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2015-03-02 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-02 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-02 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | received in House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 20, 2015 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |