KY SB5 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 39A to provide liability protection for owners of premises during a declared emergency; amend KRS 39A.020 to define terms used; amend KRS 39A.070 and 39A.090 to conform; amend KRS 39A.280 to refine the immunity of the state, private persons, volunteers, professional engineers and architects, and persons providing essential services during an emergency; EFFECTIVE MARCH 6, 2020, for Sections 1, 2, and 5 of the Act; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to emergencies and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2021-02-24Senatefloor amendment (8) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-02-24Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2021
2021-02-11Senatefloor amendment (7) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-02-11Senatefloor amendment (6) withdrawn
2021-02-10Senatefloor amendment (3) (4) (5) and (6) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-02-09Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-02-09Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2021-01-06Senatereturned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2021-01-06Senate2nd reading
2021-01-06Senatetaken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2021-01-05Senatereturned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2021-01-05Senate1st reading
2021-01-05Senatetaken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2021-01-05Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2021-01-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback