KY SB5 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - returned to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - returned to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 72.026 to increase the scope of mandatory coroner and medical examiner examinations and reporting in deaths involving a Schedule I controlled substance; amend KRS 196.286 and 196.288 to increase the scope of the required cost-savings calculations; direct that a portion of recaptured savings from criminal justice reforms be directed to funding of KY-ASAP programs operating in or under the supervision of county jails, and a portion to community mental health centers offering substance abuse treatment for heroin and other opiate abuse disorders; create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to specify the controlled substance treatment services to be offered under Medicaid; amend KRS 217.186 to increase the availability of Naloxone for use as a rescue drug for narcotic overdose situations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 218A to provide an opportunity for deferred prosecution for persons seeking emergency help in drug overdose situations; amend KRS 218A.1412 to establish a 50 percent minimum time service requirement for higher-level traffickers in heroin, to remove the quantity thresholds in heroin and fentanyl prosecutions, and to provide the ability to deviate from the service requirement in cases where the defendant provides assistance to the prosecution; amend KRS 218A.500 to exempt needles and sharps declared to a peace officer prior to a search of a defendant's person; amend KRS 439.3401 to require a minimum 50 percent time service requirement for homicide and fetal homicide offenders in situations in which the decedent died due to a Schedule I drug overdose; direct the Department of Criminal Justice Training to conduct regionalized heroin-specific in-service training for law enforcement officers by December 31, 2015.
Title
AN ACT relating to controlled substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-03 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-01-09 | House | received in House |
2015-01-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-01-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 8, 2015 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2015-01-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2015-01-07 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-01-06 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |