KY SB48 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 173.450 to 173.650 to provide for an alternative method of creating a public library district, appointing board members, levying an ad valorem tax and modifying the tax with fiscal court approval; specify the method of dissolution.
Title
AN ACT relating to public library districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2013-03-07 | House | returned to the Orders of the Day |
2013-03-07 | House | 3rd reading |
2013-03-06 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | received in House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | passed 29-6 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2013-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2013-02-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2013-02-21 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2013-02-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-01-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |