KY SB47 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 334A.010 to enact and enter into the Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact with all other jurisdictions that legally join in the compact; declare the purpose of the compact; establish definitions; recognize a multistate licensure privilege to practice for audiologists and speech-language pathologists; recognize a multistate licensure privilege for audiologists and speech-language pathologists to practice audiology and speech-language pathology via telehealth; establish provisions for active duty military personnel and their spouses; authorize a remote state to take adverse action against an audiologist or speech-language pathologist's privilege to practice within that member state; authorize a home state to take adverse action against an audiologist's or speech-language pathologist's license issued by the home state; create the Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Compact Commission; provide immunity for party states, officers, employees, or representatives of the Commission who act in accordance with the compact; require the Commission to create a database and reporting system containing licensure, adverse actions, and investigative information on all licensed individuals in member states; establish procedures for rulemaking; authorize the Commission to attempt to resolve disputes related to the compact that arise among member states and between member and non-member states; require provisions of the compact to become effective the day it is enacted into law once a state enters the Compact; provide for severability for any provision in the compact that is contrary to the constitution of any party state or of the United States or the applicability thereof to any government, agency, person, or circumstance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to audiology and speech-language pathology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1552 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-03-01Houseposted in committee
2021-02-26Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
2021-02-23Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-23Housereceived in House
2021-02-22Senate3rd reading, passed 34-1 with Committee Substitute
2021-02-11Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021
2021-02-10Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-09Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2021-01-08Senateto Licensing and Occupations (S)
2021-01-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-05Senateintroduced in Senate
2020-12-11SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback