KY SB43 | 2016 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 15)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]


Amend KRS 61.315 to make the survivors of emergency medical services providers who are killed in the line of duty on or after July 1, 2014, eligible for the state lump-sum death benefit; designate as the John Mackey Memorial Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


AN ACT relating to emergency medical services.



2016-04-01Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 15)
2016-03-22Senatedelivered to Governor
2016-03-22Senateenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2016-03-21Senatereceived in Senate
2016-03-18House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2016-03-18Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016
2016-03-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2016-03-16Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2016-03-04Houseposted in committee
2016-02-29Houseto Local Government (H)
2016-02-25Housereceived in House
2016-02-24Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-02-23Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2016
2016-02-22Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2016-02-19Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-01-07Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2016-01-06Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources

Bill Comments