KY SB41 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-08 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 224.50-585 to establish definitions; prohibit the intentional release of more than 25 plastic balloons; establish a ban on plastic, single-use carryout bags by July 1, 2027; establish a ban the provision of single-use plastic straws and Styrofoam food and beverage containers by retail food and beverage establishments by July 1, 2025; establish civil penalty of $100 per day for violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to plastic waste.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-08Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2022-01-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2022-01-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback