KY SB4 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - floor amendments (3), (4), (5), (6) and (7-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - floor amendments (3), (4), (5), (6) and (7-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 11 to require executive orders to be identified by year and subject areas and to be filed with the Secretary of State; require the Secretary of State to forward executive orders to the director of the Legislative Research Commission (LRC) on the date filed; create a process for legislative committees to review and object to executive orders; require the LRC to draft a bill each regular session to declare executive orders which have been objected to void; require the Governor to annually compile a list of all effective executive orders and deliver that list to the LRC; require executive orders to expire 90 days after the expiration of a Governor's final term of office; create a new section of KRS Chapter 12 to require administrative bodies to expire 90 days after the end of the final term of the official who created them; amend KRS 11.160 to reduce the time the Governor or other appointing authority has to deliver letters of appointment to the LRC from seven calendar days to two working days; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to government actions and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve West [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 2119 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | floor amendments (3), (4), (5), (6) and (7-title) filed |
2022-03-30 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2022-03-30 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-30 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-29 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-29 | House | to State Government (H) |
2022-03-25 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-25 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-25 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | received in House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-8 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-03-08 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Committees
Effective Dates, Emergency
General Assembly
Governor
Legislative Research Commission
Public Records and Reports
Secretary of State
Effective Dates, Emergency
General Assembly
Governor
Legislative Research Commission
Public Records and Reports
Secretary of State