KY SB4 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 174 to establish the Kentucky Transportations Board; set forth membership, appointment, qualifications, and duties; outline board duties in relation to nomination and employment of the Transportation Cabinet secretary; require the board to establish a statewide prioritization process for the use of funds apportioned pursuant to 23 U.S.C. sec. 104, with some exceptions; identify 5 factors that form the basis for the objective scoring: congestion mitigation, economic development, accessibility. safety, and asset management; allow the board to weight factors differently in each highway district; require the board to develop the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan; require advanced publication of recommended projects for the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan scored under the objective system, along with data regarding the scoring process; require advanced publication of bridge and pavement maintenance projects recommended for inclusion in the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan; amend KRS 176.430 to require the board to develop the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan; require the Department of Highways to notify the General Assembly, through the LRC, of any projects in the biennial highway construction plan which the department will not undertake in the year prescribed in the plan; amend KRS 48.110 to require the board to approve the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan before the Governor can submit the plan to the General Assembly; amend KRS 176.050 to require the Department of Highways to issue an annual list of bridge and pavement improvement needs, prioritized by safety and state of disrepair, from which the board will select projects for inclusion in the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan; amend KRS 45.247 to require that at the end of each fiscal year, any moneys in the highway construction contingency account in excess of 10% of the amount appropriated to that fund for that fiscal year will lapse to the state construction account; amend KRS 174.020 to attach the Kentucky Transportation Board to the Transportation Cabinet Office of the Secretary for administrative purposes; set forth staggered terms for initial appointments to the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to transportation and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa2, sfa4 RSN# 1242 (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1241 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18Housereturned to Transportation (H)
2020-03-18House2nd reading
2020-03-18Housetaken from Transportation (H)
2020-03-17Housereturned to Transportation (H)
2020-03-17House1st reading
2020-03-17Housetaken from Transportation (H)
2020-02-28Houseposted in committee
2020-02-24Houseto Transportation (H)
2020-02-20Housereceived in House
2020-02-20Senatepassed 25-8 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (2) and (4)
2020-02-20Senatefloor amendment (3) defeated
2020-02-20Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2020-02-20Senate3rd reading
2020-02-19Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-02-18Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-02-14Senatefloor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 18, 2020
2020-02-13Senatefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-12Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-12Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-13Senatereturned to Transportation (S)
2020-01-13Senate2nd reading
2020-01-13Senatetaken from Transportation (S)
2020-01-10Senatereturned to Transportation (S)
2020-01-10Senate1st reading
2020-01-10Senatetaken from Transportation (S)
2020-01-08Senateto Transportation (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate
2019-11-05SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback