KY SB36 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.812 to express legislative goals for career and technical education; amend KRS 158.810 to define terms related to career and technical education; create a new section to KRS Chapter 156 to require the Department of Education to issue core content standards, assess student progress, and develop new courses relevant to college and career readiness; create a new section to KRS Chapter 158 providing for the creation and use of evidence-based models assessing the needs of at-risk students; create a new section of KRS Chapter 157 to define terms related to career and technical education and to establish a career and technical education accessibility fund; amend KRS 158.814 to address unmet needs for career and technical education; amend KRS 158.816 to add criteria to the assessment of technical education students; amend KRS 18A.010 to exempt technology center employees from the count of full-time executive branch employees; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to career and technical education, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | recommitted to Education (S) | |
2011-02-04 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2011-02-03 | reported favorably, to Rules | |
2011-02-02 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-02 | returned to Education (S) | |
2011-02-02 | taken from Education (S) | |
2011-02-01 | returned to Education (S) | |
2011-02-01 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-01 | taken from Education (S) | |
2011-01-04 | to Education (S) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB36.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB36/bill.doc |