KY SB342 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.552 to provide that recontributions of a refund to the Kentucky Employees Retirement System, County Employees Retirement System, and the State Police Retirement System, made on or before January 1, 2023, shall be used to determine a member's participation date in the systems; make retroactive back to January 1, 2014, and provide that recontributions of a refund made on or after January 1, 2014 and prior to the effective date of this Act, shall be used to determine a member's participation date in the system unless the member instructs the systems by January 1, 2023, to not use the service to determine their participation date in the systems; RETROACTIVE.
Title
AN ACT relating to recontribution of a refund in the retirement systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Retirement and Pensions
Retroactive Legislation
State Agencies
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Retirement and Pensions
Retroactive Legislation
State Agencies