KY SB321 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 311.781 to 311.786 to include declarations of the General Assembly; amend KRS 311.781 to define "gestational age" and "probable gestational age" and redefine "pain-capable unborn child" to change the age from 20 weeks or more 15 weeks or more; create a new section of KRS 311.781 to 311.786 to authorize the Attorney General and the Kentucky Board of Medical Licensure on its own behalf to file an action to enforce or for violation of KRS 311.781 to 311.786; amend KRS 311.782 to prohibit abortion when the probable gestational age is 15 week or more, with specified exceptions; amend KRS 311.783 and 311.787 to conform; establish severability and that nothing in this Act creates or recognizes a right to abortion.
Title
AN ACT relating to abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2134 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | received in House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-6 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |