KY SB32 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 004)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 223.400 to add a definition of "water well driller's assistant"; amend KRS 223.405 to require water well drillers and water well driller's assistants to obtain a valid certificate before working on a water well; amend KRS 223.425 to establish the application, requirements, and effective term for the certification of water well driller's assistants; amend KRS 223.430 to allow the water well driller's assistant to work under the liability insurance and surety bond of the supervising certified water well driller; amend KRS 223.440 to prohibit the certified water well driller's assistant from certifying records required to be kept by the supervising certified water well driller; amend KRS 223.447 to establish certification and renewal fees for the water well driller and the water well driller's assistant; amend KRS 223.450 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to water well drillers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 156 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 788 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 004)
2019-02-27Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-02-27Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-02-27Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-26House3rd reading, passed 97-2
2019-02-25Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-19Houseposted in committee
2019-02-11Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2019-02-08Housereceived in House
2019-02-07Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2019-02-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 7, 2019
2019-02-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-05Senatereturned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2019-02-05Senate1st reading
2019-02-05Senatetaken from Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2019-01-08Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate
2018-11-21SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback