KY SB30 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 19)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal and reenact or repeal, reenact, and amend various sections of the Crime Victims' Bill of Rights to change statutory definition of "victim"; require that restitution to the victim be made when possible; repeal KRS 421.540; provide for a delayed contingent effective date of November 6, 2018, upon ratification of a proposed constitutional amendment providing protection of crime victims' rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to crime victims' rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 249 (Y: 79 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 431 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 431 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 19)
2018-03-12Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-03-12Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-12Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-12Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-09House3rd reading, passed 79-3
2018-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 8, 2018
2018-03-01House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-28Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-02-22Houseposted in committee
2018-02-15Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-02-13Housereceived in House
2018-02-12Senate3rd reading, passed 33-0 with floor amendment (1)
2018-02-12Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 12, 2018
2018-02-09Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2018-02-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-03Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-02Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback