KY SB3 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Propose to amend the Constitution of Kentucky to create a crime victims' bill of rights; submit to voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT proposing to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to crime victims' rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 51 (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 372 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 372 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25Housedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 1)
2018-01-25Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-01-25Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-01-24House3rd reading, passed 87-3
2018-01-23Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 24, 2018
2018-01-23House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-17Houseposted in committee
2018-01-16Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2018-01-10Housereceived in House
2018-01-10Senate3rd reading, passed 34-1 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 10, 2018
2018-01-10Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-09Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-09Senate2nd reading
2018-01-09Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-08Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-08Senate1st reading
2018-01-08Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-03Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-02Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback