KY SB293 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 84)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 84)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 42.0201 to establish the Division of Professional Services and Training and the Division of Contract Management in the Office of Material and Procurement Services in the Finance and Administration Cabinet; amend KRS 131.020 to establish the Division of Taxpayer Ombudsman within the Office of the Commissioner of the Department of Revenue; and amend KRS 131.083 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 84) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2016-03-28 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-03-25 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-23 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-22 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2016-03-22 | House | 1st reading |
2016-03-22 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2016-03-22 | House | posting waived |
2016-03-22 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-21 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-03-18 | House | received in House |
2016-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016 (Consent Orders #1) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB293.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB293/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB293/vote_history.pdf |