KY SB29 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.753 to provide that the Finance and Administration Cabinet shall reimburse the Attorney General, a Commonwealth's attorney, or a county attorney for fees or judgments after being sued for an act or omission in the course of his or her duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to indemnification of prosecutors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1542 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22Housereceived in House
2021-02-11Senate3rd reading, passed 29-0
2021-02-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021
2021-02-09Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-04Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2021-01-08Senateto Judiciary (S)
2021-01-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-05Senateintroduced in Senate
2020-08-19SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback