KY SB28 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 6.505 to close the Legislators' Retirement Plan to new members effective August 1, 2018; prohibit current legislators from participating in the Legislators' Retirement Plan on or after August 1, 2018; provide that current and future legislators may only participate in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System for any service to the General Assembly occurring on or after August 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to retirement benefits for legislators.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-02Senateintroduced in Senate
2017-09-28SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback