KY SB28 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 5)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 5)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 528.010 to include in the definition of "gambling device" an electronic device used to facilitate Internet gambling and to define "simulated gambling program"; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the placement of illegal gambling devices in business establishments and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 5) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Bill passed 35-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendment (4) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (4) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-3 with floor amendment (4) |
2015-03-11 | House | floor amendments (9) and (10-title) filed |
2015-03-10 | House | floor amendments (4) (5) (6-title) (7) and (8) filed |
2015-03-09 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) and (3-title) filed |
2015-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-02 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-02 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-02 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2015-03-02 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-27 | House | received in House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | passed 35-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Committee Substitute withdrawn |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |