KY SB27 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.637 and 78.5540 to allow a part-time adjunct instructor for the Kentucky Fire Commission who has not participated in the Kentucky Employees Retirement Systems prior to retirement, but is eligible to retire from the County Employees Retirement System, to retire and draw benefits without being required to resign from his or her position as part-time adjunct instructor for the Kentucky Fire Commission.
Title
AN ACT relating to employment of part-time adjunct instructors for the Kentucky Fire Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Nemes [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 390 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1971 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1971 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2022-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | received in House |
2022-01-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-06 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Public Officers and Employees
Retirement and Pensions
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Public Officers and Employees
Retirement and Pensions