KY SB27 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 350 to require the Energy and Environment Cabinet to notify the Department of Workplace Standards of any applicant or permittee that may be subject to the performance bonding requirements of KRS 337.200; create a new section of KRS Chapter 337 to require the commissioner of the Department of Workplace Standards to notify the Energy and Environment Cabinet of any employer engaged in the severance, preparation, or transportation of minerals that is not compliant with the performance bonding requirements of KRS 337.200; amend KRS 350.085 to prohibit the approval of mining permit applications for applicants that are not compliant with the requirements of KRS 337.200; amend KRS 350.130 to make compliance with the requirements of KRS 337.200 a condition of a mining permit issued under KRS Chapter 350 or the administrative regulations promulgated thereunder; amend KRS 337.200 to remove references to liquidated damages and attorneys' fees as provided by law; amend KRS 337.994 to require that all penalties collected for violations of KRS 337.200 be paid to employees injured by the employer's failure to post the performance bond; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to mining permits and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senaterecommitted to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2020-03-19Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-19Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-18Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-01-09Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate
2019-08-15SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback