KY SB25 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.6455 to include achieving three hours of dual credit or qualifying for three hours of postsecondary articulated credit as a postsecondary readiness indicator.
Title
AN ACT relating to postsecondary readiness indicators and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 256 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta1 RSN# 2475 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta1 RSN# 2475 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2023-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | to Education (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | received in House |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 14, 2023 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-01-05 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2023-01-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |