KY SB25 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-03 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-03 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 413.249 to expand the statute of limitations for civil actions brought for a recovery of damages for illness or injury as a result of childhood sexual abuse or sexual assault from five to ten years, provide that civil actions for illness or injury suffered as a result of childhood sexual abuse or assault that were previously barred by the statute of limitations are revived and may be brought within ten years of July 1, 2015, enumerate that claims that were previously adjudged to be time-barred by a court may not be revived under this subsection.
Title
AN ACT relating to sexually based offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2015-11-12 | Senate | To: Interim Joint Committee on Judiciary |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB25.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB25/bill.doc |