KY SB244 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 343 to establish a new restricted fund known as the apprenticeship fund; authorize the Department of Workforce Development to promulgate administrative regulations; amend KRS 141.330 to require employers to identify funds withheld from the pay of apprentices participating in apprenticeship programs; require the Department of Revenue to deposit those funds in the apprenticeship fund; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT creating the Apprenticeship fund and making an appropriation therefore.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senaterecommitted to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-17Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-04Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2020-03-02Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback