KY SB227 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 139)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 139)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 6.420 to require the Department of Kentucky State Police to brief the leadership of the General Assembly and the Legislative Research Commission on security matters relating to the Capitol campus.
Title
AN ACT relating to Capitol campus security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1742 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 302 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1637 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 302 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1637 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 139) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Bill passed 36-0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-05 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-05 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | received in House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | introduced in Senate |