KY SB227 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 311 to prohibit a person from denying or depriving an infant of nourishment with the intent to cause or allow the death of an infant; prohibit a person from denying or depriving an infant of medically appropriate and reasonable medical care, medical treatment, or surgical care; require a physician performing an abortion to take all medically appropriate and reasonable steps to preserve the life and health of a born alive infant; provide that a born alive infant shall be treated as a legal person under the laws of the Commonwealth; specify that any born alive infant, whose parents declare they do not want to keep the infant, shall immediately upon birth become a ward of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; prohibit any person from performing scientific research on a born alive infant; specify that this section shall not be construed as preventing an infant's parent or guardian from refusing medical care that is not medically necessary; specify that the parent or guardian of a born alive infant shall not be held criminally or civilly liable for the actions of a physician, nurse, or other healthcare provider that acted without his or her consent; provide for civil and administrative penalties for violations of this Act; allow for severability; allow the General Assembly by joint resolution to appoint members to intervene as a matter or right in any case that challenges the constitutionality of this Act; amend KRS 311.595, 311.850, 314.091, and 315.121 to suspend or revoke the license of any physician, physician's assistant, nurse, or pharmacist who violates this Act; amend KRS 311.990 to establish criminal penalties for violations; establish the short title of "Born Alive Infant Protection Act"; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to abortion and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 883 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1)
2019-03-04Houseposted in committee
2019-03-01Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2019-02-28Housereceived in House
2019-02-28Senate3rd reading, passed 32-0
2019-02-28Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-28Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2019-02-26Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-26Senate2nd reading
2019-02-26Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-25Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-25Senate1st reading
2019-02-25Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-20Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-15Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback