KY SB222 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 150)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 150)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 67C.103 to set forth additional requirements relating to redistricting procedures and the filling of vacancies on the legislative council; clarify the audit and investigation powers of the legislative council; grant power to the council to subpoena persons and documents and administer oaths; establish procedures for failure to comply with subpoenas and require a resolution to create certain procedures; amend KRS 67C.105 to limit the mayor to two consecutive terms; clarify budget requirements; establish a requirement to submit certain contracts to the legislative council for review and approval; require appointment of a deputy mayor; establish terms and duties of the deputy mayor; provide that the deputy mayor will become temporary mayor in case of mayoral vacancy; establish procedures for mayoral vacancy and the simultaneous vacancy of mayor and deputy mayor; amend 67C.111 to allow annexation of territory by city within the consolidated local government with the approval of 80% of property owners, all other annexations subject to previous requirements of annexation; amend KRS 67C.115 to authorize the legislative council and political caucuses to retain outside legal counsel if desired; amend KRS 67C.131 to authorize two to four two staff persons be hired for recognized caucuses of the legislative council; amend KRS 67C.139 to require the mayor to take certain criteria into account in making appointments; establish procedures for the mayor's failure to make required appointments; establish procedures whereby legislative council members may serve on agencies, boards, and commissions; require examination of "incompatible offices" prior to appointments; amend KRS 67C.143 to allow removal of a member of a board or commission by legislative council; prohibit removed persons from holding same office or position for five years; amend KRS 424.290 to clarify that certain publication costs are to be borne by units of local government; allow county clerk in a county containing a consolidated local government to publish in a newspaper candidates and issues on ballot and allow Internet publication of other ballot information.
Title
AN ACT relating to consolidated local governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 150) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Bill passed 26-12 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute |
2017-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 56-34 with Committee Substitute |
2017-03-08 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2017-03-01 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | received in House |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 24-10 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-22 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | introduced in Senate |