KY SB221 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 99)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 99)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.020 to change the name of the Office of Career Development and create the Division of Technical Assistance within the Department of Workforce Investment; amend KRS 151B.020 to change the name of the Office of Career Development and create the Division of Technical Assistance; amend KRS 200.700 to change the Early Childhood Advisory Board from the Office of the Governor to the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet; confirm Executive Order 2020-529.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Nemes [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 338 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1635 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1635 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 99) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | received in House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2021-03-01 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | introduced in Senate |