KY SB217 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 197)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 197)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to require the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources to conduct all procurements necessary for its performance pursuant to KRS Chapter 45A; provide that upon approval of the commission, the commissioner shall be deemed the chief purchasing officer for the purposes of conducting procurements for the department; make all department personal service contracts, tax incentive agreements, and memoranda of agreement subject to review by the Government Contract Review Committee; require the department, upon approval of the commission, to conduct its own bidding and procurement; amend KRS 150.021 to provide that the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources be attached administratively to the Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet only for those limited functions and purposes expressly requested by the department; remove language making the powers conferred to the department by KRS Chapters 150 and 235 subject to KRS Chapters 42, 45, 45A, 56, and 64; require the Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet to transfer to the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources copies of all records, files, and documents associated with functions that the cabinet no longer performs for the department; exempt the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources from reorganization under KRS Chapter 12; amend KRS 150.022 to change references from wildlife districts to commission districts; make commission members' terms end on December 31 of the fourth calendar year following their appointments and until their successors are duly appointed and confirmed by the Senate; require that a member serve no more than two full terms, excluding any partial terms that a member may serve; require that a candidate to be a commission member have held hunting and fishing licenses for the previous five consecutive years; require that an appointment to the commission to replace a member whose term has expired be made no later than January 20 of the year following the year in which the term expired; amend KRS 150.061 to make the commissioner the appointing authority for the department for the purposes of KRS Chapter 18A and to conform; amend KRS 235.030 to provide that the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources be attached administratively to the Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet only for those limited functions and purposes expressly requested by the department; amend KRS 45A.030, 150.0241, 235.010, and 235.130 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 547 (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2340 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 515 (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 2115 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2340 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 515 (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 2115 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 197) |
2022-04-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-04-13 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | received in Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | passed 69-24 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2022-04-13 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | received in House |
2022-04-13 | House | passed 29-8 |
2022-04-13 | House | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | House | to Rules (S) |
2022-04-13 | House | received in Senate |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Vetoed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 62-23 |
2022-03-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-23 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | received in House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28 - 2 with Committee Substitute (1) Floor Amendment (1), and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-10 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Boats and Boating
Financial Responsibility
Fish and Wildlife
Hunting and Fishing
Purchasing
State Agencies
Boats and Boating
Financial Responsibility
Fish and Wildlife
Hunting and Fishing
Purchasing
State Agencies