KY SB217 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.770 to specify that a board of education must comply with the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990, the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996, and any other applicable federal law in placing a teacher or superintendent on leave due to a physical or mental disability; prohibit a board from requesting unnecessary medical information or disclosing any medical information; amend KRS 161.790 to clarify the causes for which a contract of a teacher may be terminated; require an attorney to serve as hearing officer and chairman of the tribunal; remove the lay person from tribunal; establish selection and training requirements for hearing officers; establish a prehearing conference for motions and mediation; establish tribunal's decision as a recommended order and allow parties to file exceptions to recommended order; allow hearing officer to respond to exceptions by entering original recommended order or an amended order as a final order; limit decisions to upholding or overturning the decision of the superintendent.
Title
AN ACT relating to educators.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | recommitted to Education (S) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-16 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |