KY SB213 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - returned to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
Pending: House Tourism & Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 91A.360 to remove outdated reference to the Kentucky Hotel and Motel Association; add that hotel and motel representatives shall meet annually to submit recommendations for tourist and convention commission appointees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to tourist and convention commissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1336 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19Housereturned to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
2020-03-19House1st reading
2020-03-19Housetaken from Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
2020-03-19Houseto Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
2020-03-18Housereceived in House
2020-03-17Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0
2020-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
2020-03-11Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-10Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2020-02-27Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2020-02-25Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback