KY SB212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal and reenact KRS 164A.300 to 164A.380 as new sections of KRS Chapter 41 and amend to provide that the Kentucky Educational Savings Plan Trust is to be administered by the Department of the Treasury; amend various sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Educational Savings Plan Trust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/sb212.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/sb212/orig_bill.pdf |