KY SB211 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 500.080 to define "public assistance benefits," "emergency services personnel," "firework," and "riot"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 508 to require restitution for a violation of assault in the first, second, third, and fourth degree; create a new section of KRS Chapter 511 to create the crime of unlawful camping on property owned by the Commonwealth; create a new section of KRS Chapter 512 to require restitution for a violation of criminal mischief in the first, second, and third degree; amend KRS 508.010, 508.020, 508.025, 508.030, 512.020, 512.030, 512.040, 520.090, 525.015, 525.060, 525.140, and 525.160 to provide enhanced penalties for violations of these offenses during the course of a riot; amend KRS 520.020, 525.030, and 525.040 to provide enhanced penalties; create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to restrict when a person shall be released after an arrest for a violation of an offense of during the course of a riot; amend KRS 439.340 to add violations of KRS 508.020 and 508.025 committed during the course of a riot to the definition of violent offender; create a new section of KRS Chapter 15 to state legislative findings and declarations; amend KRS 411.100 to require gross negligence for a cause of action for property damaged by riotous or tumultuous assemblage of people that a local government could have prevented; amend KRS 61.912, 61.914, 61.168, 525.010, 532.100, and 525.200 to make conforming changes; provide that this Act may be cited as the Community and First Responder Protection Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 sfa2 RSN# 1697 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 22-11 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-04 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Cities
Corrections Impact
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Government
Local Mandate
Short Titles and Popular Names
Corrections Impact
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Government
Local Mandate
Short Titles and Popular Names