KY SB209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 152)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 152)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 16.198 to require the Kentucky State Police to promulgate administrative regulations to establish vacation and sick leave and holiday pay for Trooper R and commercial vehicle enforcement R Class employees.
Title
AN ACT relating to public employee benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Nemes [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2285 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 301 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2089 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 301 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2089 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 152) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | passed 36-0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-09 | House | to State Government (H) |
2022-03-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-04 | House | received in House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 04, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, State
State Agencies
State Employees
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, State
State Agencies
State Employees