KY SB207 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 151B to establish the Kentucky Education and Workforce Collaborative to implement the policies developed by the Kentucky Workforce Innovation Board; establish membership and articulate responsibilities of the collaborative; authorize service coordination and combination service programs; articulate responsibilities of local workforce development boards; establish performance milestones and deadlines for attainment; require annual reporting beginning July 1, 2025.
Title
AN ACT relating to workforce development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 559 (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2347 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2284 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 411 (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2159 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2347 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2284 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 411 (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2159 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 220) |
2022-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-04-14 | House | received in Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | passed 75-18 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | Senate | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2022-04-13 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | received in House |
2022-04-13 | House | passed 28-8 |
2022-04-13 | House | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | House | to Rules (S) |
2022-04-13 | House | received in Senate |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Vetoed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | passed 29-7 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 82-13 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-23 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2022-03-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-18 | House | received in House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Federal Laws and Regulations
Governor
Labor and Industry
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Workforce
Governor
Labor and Industry
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Workforce