KY SB205 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - recommitted to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - recommitted to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.690 to insert gender-neutral language.
Title
AN ACT relating to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | recommitted to Agriculture (S) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2015-03-09 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-02-27 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-19 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |