KY SB201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.880 to allow persons to complain to the Attorney General if the person feels that the intent of the open records law has been subverted by an agency by delaying past the three day time period for answering an open records request, or by excessive extensions of time.
Title
AN ACT relating to open records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1634 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | received in House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Attorney General
Local Government
Local Mandate
Public Authorities
Public Officers and Employees
Public Records and Reports
State Agencies
Universities and Colleges
Local Government
Local Mandate
Public Authorities
Public Officers and Employees
Public Records and Reports
State Agencies
Universities and Colleges