KY SB200 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 610.110 to require risk and needs assessment and make language gender neutral.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the juvenile justice system and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-25Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 132)
2014-04-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2014-04-14Senateenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2014-04-14Senatepassed 30-8
2014-04-14SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute
2014-04-14Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute
2014-03-27Senatereceived in Senate
2014-03-27House3rd reading, passed 84-15 with Committee Substitute
2014-03-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 27, 2014
2014-03-27Housetaken from Rules
2014-03-26Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute Judiciary (H)
2014-03-24Houseposted in committee
2014-03-24Houseto Judiciary (H)
2014-03-21Housereturned to Committee on Committees (H)
2014-03-21House1st reading
2014-03-21Housetaken from Committee on Committees (H)
2014-03-21Housereceived in House
2014-03-20Senatepassed 31-7 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2)
2014-03-20Senatefloor amendments (1) and (3) withdrawn
2014-03-20Senate3rd reading
2014-03-19Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2014-03-18Senatefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2014-03-18Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 19, 2014
2014-03-17Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2014-03-14Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2014-03-13Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2014-03-07Senateto Judiciary (S)
2014-03-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback