KY SB20 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 6)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 6)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 5.005 to establish that an action challenging the constitutionality of any created legislative district shall be filed in the Circuit Court of the plaintiff's residence; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to legislative redistricting challenges and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 16 (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1940 (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1940 (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 6) |
2022-01-08 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-01-08 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-01-08 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-01-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-4 |
2022-01-08 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2022-01-08 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-01-07 | House | returned to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2022-01-07 | House | 2nd reading |
2022-01-07 | House | taken from Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | 1st reading |
2022-01-06 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | received in House |
2022-01-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-1 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 06, 2022 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-01-05 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2022-01-05 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-01-04 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |