KY SB20 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 216C.010 to define "affidavit of merit"; create new section of Chapter 216C to require filing of medical malpractice action with an affidavit of merit; amend KRS 422.317 to regulate fees charged by a hospital or health care provider to provide a copy of medical records; create a new section of KRS Chapter 216C to limit a claimant's attorney fees in a malpractice claim against a health care provider; amend KRS 216C.030 and 311.377 to conform; create a new section of the Kentucky Rules of Evidence to prohibit the introduction of expressions of sympathy, compassion, commiseration, or a general sense of benevolence in medical malpractice actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to health care providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1, SFA 2, SFA 3 RSN# 486 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 486 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09Houseposted in committee
2018-03-06Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-03-02Housereceived in House
2018-03-01Senate3rd reading, passed 20-16 with floor amendments (1) (2) and (3)
2018-02-28Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2018
2018-02-23Senatefloor amendment (3) filed
2018-02-15Senatefloor amendment (2) filed
2018-02-12Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2018-02-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-04Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-01-03Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback