KY SB2 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 7)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 13A.010 to define “legislative committee”; amend KRS 13A.030 to include emergency administrative regulations without adequate justification in the list of administrative regulations that may be found deficient; amend KRS 13A.040 to conform; amend KRS 13A.190 to specify requirements for an emergency administrative regulation, provide for public comment and legislative review, specify submission requirements for documentary evidence; amend KRS 13A.220 to require specified information about an administrative regulation to be displayed on the agency Web site; amend KRS 13A.2251 and 13A.2255 to require material incorporated by reference to be displayed on the agency Web site; amend KRS 13A.250 to conform; amend KRS 13A.270 to include public hearings and written comment periods for emergency administrative regulations; amend KRS 13A.280 to include amending an emergency regulation at a legislative committee meeting; amend KRS 13A.290 to conform; amend KRS 13A.300 to conform and to allow a legislative committee to find an emergency regulation deficient if no representation from the administrative body appears; amend KRS 13A.310 to conform and to allow an emergency regulation to be withdrawn under certain conditions; amend KRS 13A.312 to stipulate that transfers of authority or name changes of administrative bodies by executive order during an interim period shall be returned to their previous forms if not codified or confirmed during the next regular session of the General Assembly; amend KRS 13A.315 and 13A.320 to conform; amend KRS 13A.330 to conform and to describe the process to be followed after an emergency administrative regulation is found deficient; amend KRS 13A.331, 13A.335, 13A.336, and 13A.338 to conform; amend KRS 214.020 to require administrative regulations promulgated under the section to be in effect no longer than 30 days if imposing restrictions on gatherings or imposing mandatory quarantine or isolation requirements, include penalty, appeal and due process information, and contain public hearing and written comment periods; amend KRS 214.990 to include violations of KRS Chapter 13A. EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to administrative regulations and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 39 (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1520 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/hfa1 RSN# 1509 (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 20 (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sca 1T RSN# 1501 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02Housedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 7)
2021-02-02Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-02-02Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-02-02Housereceived in Senate
2021-02-02SenateBill passed 69-20
2021-02-02Senateveto overridden
2021-02-02Senateplaced in the Orders of the Day for consideration of the Governor's Veto
2021-02-02Senatetaken from Rules (H)
2021-02-02Senateto Rules (H)
2021-02-02Senatereceived in House
2021-02-02HouseBill passed 31-6
2021-02-02Houseveto overridden
2021-02-02Houseposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto for Tuesday, February 2, 2021
2021-02-02Housetaken from Rules
2021-02-02Houseto Rules (S)
2021-02-02Housereceived in Senate
2021-01-19SenateVetoed
2021-01-09Senatedelivered to Governor
2021-01-09Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-01-09Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-01-09Senatepassed 29-4
2021-01-09SenateSenate concurred in House floor amendment (1)
2021-01-09Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (1)
2021-01-09Senatereceived in Senate
2021-01-09House3rd reading, passed 74-21 with floor amendment (1)
2021-01-08Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2021-01-08Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for January 9, 2021
2021-01-08Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2021-01-07Houseposted in committee
2021-01-07Houseto State Government (H)
2021-01-07House1st reading
2021-01-07Housetaken from Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-07Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-07Housereceived in House
2021-01-07Senate3rd reading, passed 31-6 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-01-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 7, 2021
2021-01-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-01-05Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-05Senate1st reading
2021-01-05Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-05Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback