KY SB2 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 117 to allow a voter to cast a provisional ballot if the voter is unable to produce proof of identification, by executing a provisional voter's affidavit furnished by the State Board of Elections; describe the voting procedure for casting a provisional ballot; describe how to validate a provisional ballot or provisional absentee ballot by requiring the provisional voter to appear before the county clerk or county board of elections to provide an affidavit stating that the voter is the same individual who cast the provisional ballot or provisional absentee ballot, and to either show proof of identification or give a sworn statement as to the reasonable impediment that precluded the voter from obtaining proof of identification with an accompanying Social Security card, an identification card that has been approved by the State Board of Elections, any identification card with picture and signature, or a credit card; amend KRS 116.065 to include provisional ballots and provisional absentee ballots in the requirements for verification and the penalties of perjury; amend KRS 117.066 to clarify that there are two ballot boxes that are transferred to the county board of elections and to conform; amend KRS 117.077 to require proof of identification to be sent with the absentee ballot request; provide for the voter to cast a provisional absentee ballot if the voter did not submit proof of identification; amend KRS 117.085 to set out the requirements for provisional absentee voting when voting by mail and for canceling the absentee ballots when the voter is able to vote in person on election day; amend KRS 117.0851 to include provisional absentee ballots with absentee ballots in the tabulation procedures; amend KRS 117.086 to provide instructions to the absentee voter on how to vote a provisional absentee ballot; include provisional absentee ballots in absentee voting procedures; provide for provisional absentee ballots for persons who appear in person to vote an absentee ballot but who are unable to provide proof of identification; require separate ballot boxes and lists for absentee ballots and provisional absentee ballots; amend KRS 117.0863 to include provisional absentee ballots in the requirements for absentee ballots; amend KRS 117.0865 to include provisional absentee ballots in the prohibition against aiding another in completing an absentee ballot or encouraging the voter to vote in a particular way; amend KRS 117.087 to exclude all provisional absentee ballots from the requirements in the section; amend KRS 117.145 to require the county clerk to print a sufficient number of provisional absentee ballots, provisional voter affidavits, and provisional ballots; specify the form of the provisional absentee ballot, and provisional ballots; amend KRS 117.175 to include instructions for filling out provisional ballots, and provisional voter affidavits in the instruction cards provided by the county clerk; amend KRS 117.187 to include instruction on proof of identification in the training provided by the county board of elections; amend KRS 117.195 to include provisional ballots, provisional voter affidavits, and a locked ballot box for provisional ballots in the items furnished to each precinct by the county clerk; amend KRS 117.225 to require that a voter provide proof of identification in order to cast a vote in a precinct polling place; provide an exception to requiring proof of identification if the voter resides in a state licensed care facility where the voting is taking place; amend KRS 117.227 to delete the requirement that a person's identify may be confirmed by personal acquaintance or by specific documents other than those documents designated as providing proof of identification in this Act; amend KRS 117.245 to specify that the challenge procedures do not apply to failure to provide proof of identification; amend KRS 117.255 to include provisional voters and provisional ballots in the instructions for marking a spoiled ballot; amend KRS 117.265 to include provisional voters and provisional ballots in the instructions for write-in candidates; amend KRS 117.275 to provide for tabulation of provisional ballots by the county board of elections; amend KRS 117.305 to include provisional ballots and provisional absentee ballots in the recanvassing procedures; amend KRS 117.365 to include provisional voter affidavits in the documents to be presented to the grand jury; amend KRS 117.375 to include provisional ballot and provisional absentee ballot in the definition of "ballot" or "official ballot" and to define "proof of identification," "provisional voter," and "provisional ballot" or "provisional absentee ballot"; amend KRS 117.383 to include provisional ballot cards in the State Board of Elections requirement to design ballot cards; amend KRS 117.385 to include instructions on how a voter is to place a provisional ballot with the accompanying affidavit in the appropriate envelope and box in the presence of a precinct election officer; amend KRS 117.995 to include provisional voting in the penalty provisions relating to voting; amend KRS 118.015 to define "ballot" or "official ballot" to include provisional ballots and provisional absentee ballots; amend KRS 118.305 to require the county clerk to print provisional ballots and provisional absentee ballots for the voting machines, and to ensure that provisional absentee ballots are not tabulated or recorded for any candidate who was replaced; provide that candidates for members of boards of education shall have their names printed on the provisional ballots; ensure that only duly nominated candidates shall have their names printed on provisional absentee ballots and provisional ballots; amend KRS 118.405 to prohibit more than one appearance of a candidate's name on any provisional ballot or provisional absentee ballot; amend KRS 118A.010 to define "ballot" or "official ballot" to include provisional ballots and provisional absentee ballots; amend KRS 118A.100 to require county clerks to print on provisional ballots and provisional absentee ballots the candidates for offices of the Court of Justice; amend KRS 118A.130 to prohibit a judicial candidates name from appearing more than once on a provisional ballot or a provisional absentee ballot; amend KRS 118A.150 to allow only duly nominated candidates to the Court of Justice to have their names printed on provisional absentee ballots and provisional ballots; amend KRS 119.005 to redefine "ballot" or "official ballot" to include provisional ballots and provisional absentee ballots; amend KRS 120.005 to redefine "ballot" or "official ballot" to include provisional ballots and provisional absentee ballots; amend KRS 186.531 to allow a free standard personal identification card to an individual who does not then currently have a valid operator's license or commercial driver's license, is at least 18 years of age, and is otherwise eligible to vote in the regular election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to voter identification and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-13Senate2nd reading
2020-01-13Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-10Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-10Senate1st reading
2020-01-10Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-08Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback