KY SB2 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Propose amendment to Section 54 of the Constitution of Kentucky to allow the General Assembly the power to limit damages for injuries resulting in death or for injuries to persons or property, and to provide a uniform statute of limitations; provide for submission to the voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT proposing an amendment to Section 54 of the Constitution of Kentucky.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09Senaterecommitted to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-08Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-07Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-06Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-05Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-02Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-01Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-28Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-27Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-26Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-23Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-23Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-22Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-21Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-20Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-16Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-15Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-14Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-02-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 14, 2018
2018-02-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-03Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-02Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback