KY SB192 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 035)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 035)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 58.190 to apply the statute of limitations for challenging an action by a governmental agency adopting a lease to be the same 30-day period for challenging any ordinance or resolution; amend KRS 65.942 and 58.040 to conform; amend KRS 424.360 to allow notices of competitive bond sales to be posted in an electronic bidding system as an alternative advertising method; amend KRS 103.200 to include within the definition of industrial building any use by an entity recognized by the Internal Revenue Service as an organization described in 26 U.S.C. sec. 501(c)(3) in any manner related to or in the furtherance of that entity's exempt purposes; amend KRS 103.2101 to conform notice date and extend the maximum length of any bond authorization to 40 years; amend KRS 424.130 to clarify that failure to properly publish a notice of adoption of an ordinance or resolution will not void the adoption unless the failure continues for a period of 15 days; amend KRS 66.310 to conform the notice date for a hearing; amend KRS 66.400 to clarify that a general obligation pledge is a pledge of taxes, to limit garnishment of public funds, and allow for periodic payment of judgments in the case of bankruptcy.
Title
AN ACT relating to public finance.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve West [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 268 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 888 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 888 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 035) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-1 |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-03-01 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | received in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2019-02-25 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |