KY SB192 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 66)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 443.053 to provide that so long as there is no material change to an existing contract, an entity, corporation, and organization currently contracted with a unit of local government, combination of units of local government, or regional authority to provide health care services may seek to or be awarded a contract with the Department of Corrections to provide healthcare services governed under this section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to contracts for health care services for inmates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-25Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 66)
2015-03-25Senatedelivered to Governor
2015-03-24Senateenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2015-03-24SenateBill passed 34-4
2015-03-24SenateConference Committee report adopted in Senate
2015-03-24Senatereceived in Senate
2015-03-24HouseBill passed 100-0
2015-03-24HouseConference Committee report adopted in House
2015-03-24HouseConference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2015-03-24HouseFree Conference Committee tentatively appointed in House and Senate
2015-03-24HouseHouse refused to recede from Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1)
2015-03-24Houseposted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1)
2015-03-24Housereceived in House
2015-03-11SenateConference Committee tentatively appointed in House and Senate
2015-03-11SenateSenate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1)
2015-03-11Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1)
2015-03-11Senateto Rules (S)
2015-03-11Senatereceived in Senate
2015-03-11House3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1)
2015-03-10Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015
2015-03-10Housetaken from Rules
2015-03-10Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2015-03-10Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1)
2015-03-09Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2015-03-09House2nd reading
2015-03-09Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2015-03-04Houseposting waived
2015-03-04Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2015-03-04House1st reading
2015-03-04Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2015-03-04Houseto Judiciary (H)
2015-03-03Housereceived in House
2015-03-03Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2015-03-02Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2015
2015-02-26Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2015-02-25Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2015-02-19Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2015-02-13Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback